California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016