Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hall.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1262.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|