LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2048
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2048
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2048
Compare Versions
AB2048 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2048 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2048 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2048 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2048 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2048 Amended March 16, 2016
AB2048 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2048 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2048 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2048 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2048 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2048 Amended April 7, 2016
AB2048 Amended March 16, 2016
AB2048 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare