California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2053 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016