California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016