LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2057
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2057
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2057
Compare Versions
AB2057 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB2057 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2057 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2057 Amended August 16, 2016
AB2057 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2057 Amended April 4, 2016
AB2057 Amended March 16, 2016
AB2057 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2057 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB2057 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB2057 Amended August 19, 2016
AB2057 Amended August 16, 2016
AB2057 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2057 Amended April 4, 2016
AB2057 Amended March 16, 2016
AB2057 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare