Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |