California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016