Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |