LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2068
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2068
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2068
Compare Versions
AB2068 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AB2068 Enrolled August 17, 2016
AB2068 Amended April 18, 2016
AB2068 Amended March 28, 2016
AB2068 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2068 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AB2068 Enrolled August 17, 2016
AB2068 Amended April 18, 2016
AB2068 Amended March 28, 2016
AB2068 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare