LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB207
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB207
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB207
Action History
Assembly
05/04/2015
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
03/25/2015
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
02/09/2015
Referred to Com. on ED.
Assembly
01/30/2015
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
Assembly
01/29/2015
Read first time. To print.