California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016