Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4685.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |