California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2077 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016