Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4956.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |