Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4361.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |