|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5870.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4877.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4564.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|