California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2085 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2016

Amended

Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016