California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016