California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2097 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016