California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2099 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016