|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2456.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1705.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|