Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4594.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|