California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2105 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 10, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 28, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016