Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 1757.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2015 | Read first time. To print. |