California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016