California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Amended

Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016