California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016