|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5139.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4718.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|