|
09/13/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5014.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|