Assembly | 05/12/2015 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2015 | Read first time. To print. |