Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |