08/17/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 131, Statutes of 2016. | |||
08/17/2016 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/05/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/02/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4723.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4565.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |