California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016