California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill June 28, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016