09/27/2016 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/22/2016 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 4985.). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 4459.) | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4355.) | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |