Assembly | 05/31/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |