Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 5075.) Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5094.) | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 12). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |