|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5160.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4594.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|