Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | Read first time. To print. |