|
07/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4649.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4785.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|