Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5511.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5141.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|