California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2164 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016