|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 640, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6470.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5419.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 4496.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|