|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 518, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5871.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4879.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5078.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|