California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 28, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016