|
09/28/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6580.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6582.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5589.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5591.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5027.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|