Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |