California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016