Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4255.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |